Habig v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Habig
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company and Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05462
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 44 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/10/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 19, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
February 8, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habig v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Habig
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?