Hefler v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Plaintiff: Gary Hefler
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, John G. Stumpf, John R. Shrewsberry and Carrie L. Tolstedt
Movant: Amy Cook and Victoria Shaev
Case Number: 3:2016cv05479
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 238 Motion for Settlement; granting 239 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 225 Motion for Settlement; granting 226 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Fairness Hearing set for 12/18/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Correction of docket no. 233. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 8, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 199 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Initial Case Management Conference filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Substituting Lead Counsel filed by Guy Solomonov, Marcelo Mizuki, Union Asset Management Holding AG, Gary Hefler. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hefler v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hefler
Represented By: Aelish Marie Baig
Represented By: Jason C Davis
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Shrewsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L. Tolstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Amy Cook
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Victoria Shaev
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?