Cogenra Solar, Inc. et al v. SolarCity Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Cogenra Solar, Inc. and Khosla Ventures III, L.P.
Defendant: SolarCity Corporation and Silevo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05481
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2017. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
May 25, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Dismiss. Refiled discovery letter due by 5/31/2017. Refiled First Amended Complaint and motion to dismiss briefs due by 6/2/2017. Amended complaint due by 6/8/2017. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
October 18, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal without prejudice to renewed motion. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cogenra Solar, Inc. et al v. SolarCity Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cogenra Solar, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Amrhein
Represented By: Jonathan E. Barbee
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Robert J. Gunther, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher R. Noyes
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder
Represented By: Anh-Khoa Thien Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khosla Ventures III, L.P.
Represented By: Alexandra Amrhein
Represented By: Jonathan E. Barbee
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Robert J. Gunther, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher R. Noyes
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder
Represented By: Anh-Khoa Thien Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarCity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silevo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?