Shaev v. Baker, II et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Shaev
Defendant: John D. Baker, II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Lloyd H. Dean, Elizabeth A. Duke, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Donald M. James, Cynthia M. Milligan, Federico F. Pena, James H. Quigly, Stephen W. Sanger, John G. Stumpf, Susan G. Swenson, Carrie L. Tolstedt and Suzanne M. Vautrinot
Case Number: 3:2016cv05541
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: APPOINTMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS PURSUANT TO RULE OF EVIDENCE 706. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2019. (Attachments: # 1 cv)(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 268 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING DEADLINES REGARDING ANTICIPATED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT filed by Wells Fargo & Co. Deadline to file motion for preliminary appro val of settlement agreement 2/28/2019. Deadline to file opposition to motion for preliminary approval 3/14/2019. Deadline to file reply to any opposition to motion for preliminary approval 3/21/2019. Hearing on motion for preliminary approval set for 4/4/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (51 in 3:18-cv-02866-JST) (251 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Feuer Complaint filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (204) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:16-cv-05541-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 182 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning the Deadline for Answering the Complaint filed by Federico F. Pena, James H. Quigley, Susan E. Engel, Elizabeth A. Duke, Donald M . James, Judith M. Runstad, Susan G. Swenson, Stephen W. Sanger, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., John D. Baker, II, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Cynthia M. Milligan, John S. Chen, Elaine L. Chao, Lloyd H. Dean. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning the Deadline for Answering the Complaint filed by Federico F. Pena, James H. Quigley, Susan E. Engel, Elizabeth A. Duke, Donald M . James, Judith M. Runstad, Susan G. Swenson, Stephen W. Sanger, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., John D. Baker, II, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Cynthia M. Milligan, John S. Chen, Elaine L. Chao, Lloyd H. Dean. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendant John G. Stumpf's Response to the Consolidated Complaint filed by John G. Stumpf. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part (34) Motion to (1) Consolidate Related Actions; (2) Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs; and (3) Appoint Co-Lead Counsel; granting (41) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 3:16-cv-05541-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (38 in 3:16-cv-05592-JST) re STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (15 in 3:16-cv-06262-JST) STIPULA TION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (6 in 3:16-cv-06624-MEJ) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder De rivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (16 in 3:16-cv-05745-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by Alison Sherman, (35 in 3:16-cv-055 41-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (13 in 3:16-cv-05817-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Relat ed Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (9 in 3:16-cv-06631-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmi ngham Retirement and Relief System, (14 in 3:16-cv-05915-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaev v. Baker, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Shaev
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Rachele Renee Rickert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Baker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine L. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd H. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico F. Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Quigly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan G. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L. Tolstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Vautrinot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?