Rana et al v. Gu et al

Plaintiff: Kashif Rana and Saima Anjum
Defendant: Youxin Gu and J.C. Invest Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05589
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 47 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 13, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER CONCERNING RETURN OF PLAINTIFFS' BOND. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 8, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RETURN BOND AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Hon. William Alsup granting 37 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ming Ji terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 8, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Settlement. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 6, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, Motions terminated: 15 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte) filed by Kashif Rana, Saima Anjum. Replies due by 10/27/2016. Responses due by 10/20/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/3/2016 08:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rana et al v. Gu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youxin Gu
Represented By: Ming Ji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Invest Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ming Ji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashif Rana
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saima Anjum
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?