Hurtado v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hurtado
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv05608
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1920 filed by Jonathan Hurtado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 25, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REMANDING CASE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Second Extension of Time to File Reply Brief filed by Jonathan Hurtado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Defendant's MSJ filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR REMAND filed by Jonathan Hurtado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurtado v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hurtado
Represented By: Joanna H Parnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?