Collins et al v. County of San Mateo et al

Plaintiff: George Collins, Kornelia Collins and S.C. (minor)
Defendant: Diana Damrosch, Caroline Bracamonte, Helen McClain and County of San Mateo
Case Number: 3:2016cv05629
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 TO DISMISS THE ACTION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41 filed by S.C. (minor), Kornelia Collins, George Collins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
October 25, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Case Management and Pre-Trial Order for Jury Trial filed by S.C. (minor), Kornelia Collins, George Collins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
August 7, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting 50 Administrative motion to reassign settlement judge. The matter shall be reassigned for a settlement conference before a randomly selected magistrate judge. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 31, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/31/2018. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
February 8, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: 33 Plaintiffs' suggested order concerning juvenile dependency records. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. County of San Mateo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Collins
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kornelia Collins
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.C. (minor)
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Marinho
Represented By: Robert Ross Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Damrosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Bracamonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?