Mazzaferro v. Parisi et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Mazzaferro
Defendant: William Parisi, Ken Johnson, Spencer Crum, Lynn Searle, The State Bar of California and California Continuing Education of the Bar
Case Number: 3:2016cv05641
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND VACATING HEARINGS, Motions terminated: 93 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Ronald Spencer Mazzaferro, 106 MOTION to Alter Judgment PLAINTIFF RONALD MAZZ AFERROS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CORRECTION OF JUDGMENT INCORPORATED UNDERLYING INCORRECT ORDER filed by Ronald Spencer Mazzaferro. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/11/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017) Modified on 8/11/2017 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/24/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 100 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 7, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 88 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 8, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROPOSED JUDGMENT re 85 Proposed Order filed by Lynn Searle Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/8/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 11, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ONE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TWO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting 67 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting 68 Motion to Dismiss]. Amended Pleadings due by NOON on 5/25/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 25, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS [re 68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lynn Searle]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/25/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
March 9, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS PARISI AND SEARLE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
February 27, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ONE MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR OTHER PENDING MOTIONS by Hon. William Alsup [finding as moot 31 Motion to Dismiss].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
November 29, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING by Hon. William Alsup granting 9 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzaferro v. Parisi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Searle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Bar of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Continuing Education of the Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?