Gonzalez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Louie Gonzalez
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Ditech Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv05678
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 7, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Stipulation for dismissal of Defendant Ditech Financial LLC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 25, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT DITECH FINANCIAL, LLCS 29 MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 4, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 23 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
November 1, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Gonzalez
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Xiyi Fu
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?