Teresa Robles v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Robles
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv05693
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Equifax, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 17, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 23, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS EQUIFAX AND WELLS FARGO'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiff wish to file an amended pleading, such amended complaint shall be filed no later than July 7, 2017. In light thereof, the Case Management Conference is continued from July 14, 2017, to August 11, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 2, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 16, 2017, to July 14, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/02/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017) Modified on 6/2/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearings scheduled for May 19, 2017 on defendants Wells Fargo and Equifax's motions to dismiss are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
April 24, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The hearings on Wells Fargo and Equifax's motions to dismiss are continued to Friday May 19, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 20, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND ORDER VACATING HEARING ON EXPERIAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The April 28, 2017, hearing on Experian's motion to dismiss is hereby vacated, without prejudice to Experian's renoticing the motion in the event the settlement is not effectuated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 13, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 10, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 29, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearings on Experian, Wells Fargo, and Equifax's motions to dismiss are continued to April 28, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 10, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 24, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing is continued to April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 20, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AND EQUIFAX, INC.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The hearings are continued to April 7, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 5, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for January 27, 2017, is continued to May 12, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/8/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 1, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/1/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 14, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/14/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teresa Robles v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Robles
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?