Messano v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Messano
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc. and Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv05697
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/21/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 9, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS FCRA CLAIM AGAINST EQUIFAX AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE STATEMENT RE: FCRA CLAIM AGAINST BANK OF AMERICA. Statement/Notice due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/9/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
May 31, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Stipulation for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 8, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT EQUIFAXS 27 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 11, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 52 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
January 4, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING JOINT 28 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 3, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 3, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Initial Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messano v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Messano
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?