Llamas v. Seibel

Defendant: Kimberly A Seibel
Petitioner: Leonard L. Llamas
Case Number: 3:2016cv05812
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
January 9, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE - The clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and the 1 Petition and all attachments thereto upon respondent and respondent's counsel. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
November 22, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/22/2016. (nclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Llamas v. Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonard L. Llamas
Represented By: Frederick Martin Schnider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?