First American Specialty Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: First American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Carmax Auto Superstores California, LLC and Carmax Auto Superstores West Coast, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05951
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
July 31, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Ford Motor Company.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 13, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 35 Motion for Hearing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 6, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 40 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 8, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup denying 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
February 21, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First American Specialty Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward William Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Joan Alexis Rabutaso Camagong
Represented By: Andrew L. Chang
Represented By: Edward Bohatch Gaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax Auto Superstores California, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax Auto Superstores West Coast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?