Depianti et al v. Jan-Pro Franchising International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Giovani Depianti, Hyun Ki Kim, Kyu Jin Roh, Gerardo Vazquez, Gloria Roman, Juan Aguilar, Nicole Rhodes, Mateo Garduno, Chiara Harris and Todor Sinapov
Defendant: Jan-Pro Franchising International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv05961
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2017 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REDUCING COSTS re 271 Objection filed by Gerardo Vazquez, Gloria Roman, Juan Aguilar Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/20/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
June 29, 2017 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE OBJECTION TO BILL OF COSTS re 271 Objection filed by Gerardo Vazquez, Gloria Roman, Juan Aguilar Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/29/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
May 24, 2017 266 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 3, 2017 262 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
March 29, 2017 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING EXTRA PAGES ON REPLY AND SURREPLY by Hon. William Alsup granting 254 Administrative Motion exceed page limit.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
January 19, 2017 242 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2017. Motions due by 2/16/2017. Replies due by 3/30/2017. Responses due by 3/16/2017. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 17, 2017 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY MARK ROSIN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 237 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 13, 2017 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY MARK ROSIN by Hon. William Alsup denying 224 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depianti et al v. Jan-Pro Franchising International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovani Depianti
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyun Ki Kim
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyu Jin Roh
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Vazquez
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Roman
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Rhodes
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mateo Garduno
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiara Harris
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todor Sinapov
Represented By: Michael Louis Freedman
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Shannon E. Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan-Pro Franchising International, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum
Represented By: Christopher M. Pardo
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?