Adobe Systems Incorporated v. MedAssets, Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: MedAssets, Incorporated and nThrive Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2016cv05962
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 01/17/2017 Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 5, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Morgan. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey C. Morgan. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. MedAssets, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Sean Michael Callagy
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedAssets, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nThrive Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?