Tidwell v. JPMC Speciality Mortgage LLC

Appellant: Edward C. Tidwell
Appellee: JPMC Speciality Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06149
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF (granting in part 21 ) by Hon. William Alsup. Appellant Brief due by 6/13/2017. Appellee Brief due by 7/13/2017. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 25, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
March 3, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/3/2017. Show Cause Response due by 3/24/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
February 13, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
November 15, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/15/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. JPMC Speciality Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edward C. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JPMC Speciality Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Esterkin
Represented By: Randall D. Naiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?