Lewis v. Dow Chemical Corporation

Plaintiff: Bernard Lewis
Defendant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv06165
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 47 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
March 1, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Wednesday, 3/7/2018 09:01 AM. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by Monday, 3/5/2018.Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/1/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 13, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dkt. no. 39 .Plaintiff Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2018. Defense response to plaintiff's statement due 2/23/18. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
September 14, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Bernard Lewis, Dow Chemical Corporation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/14/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
January 11, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR PHONE CONFERENCE re 11 Stipulation filed by Bernard Lewis Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 1/30/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. ADR Telephone Conference reset to 1/27/2017 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/11/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Dow Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Lewis
Represented By: Robert F. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Represented By: John C. Fish, Jr.
Represented By: Emily Erin O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?