Comcast Cable Communications, LLC v. OpenTV, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Defendant: OpenTV, Inc. and Nagravision SA
Case Number: 3:2016cv06180
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER RE 149 151 PILOT MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING 158 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE 102 MOTION TO STRIKE AND 101 MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (denying as moot 96 Motion to Dismiss and 100 Cross-Motion to Amend) by Judge Alsup. Defendants are required to E-FILE the amended document. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS TO FILE CHOSEN CLAIM by Hon. William Alsup granting 94 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR 85 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/21/2017. Responses due by 3/27/2017. Replies due by 3/31/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE PILOT SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/13/2017. Motions due by 6/26/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JASON LISS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 28 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC v. OpenTV, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary Virginia Sooter
Represented By: Kathryn Diane Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenTV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagravision SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?