Yvette Felarca v. Berkeley Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: Yvette Felarca
Defendant: Berkeley Unified School District, Donald Evans, Beatriz Leyva-Cutler, Ty Alper, Judy Appel, Josh Daniels, Karen Hemphill, Lisa Van Thillo, Evelyn Tamondong-Bradley, Janet Levenson and Marc Coplan
Case Number: 3:2016cv06184
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 15, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 31 TO MODIFY CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
January 23, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Further Modify Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearings due to Plaintiff's Counsel's Health. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/23/2017 Continued to 3/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing previously set for 2/9/2017 Continued to 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
November 28, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 15 TO FURTHER MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 22, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 12 to (1) Strike as Moot Portions of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (2) Re-Schedule Hearing, and (3) Modify Briefing Schedule. Preliminary Injunction Hearing previously set for 12/8/2016 Continued to 2/2/2017 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
October 26, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Denying 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/8/2016 at 01:30 PM. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yvette Felarca v. Berkeley Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Felarca
Represented By: Ronald Cruz
Represented By: Shanta Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Unified School District
Represented By: Jerome Schreibstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz Leyva-Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Van Thillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Tamondong-Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Coplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?