CORTEZ et al v. City Of Oakland et al

Plaintiff: OLGA CORTEZ, NEMESIO CORTEZ, K.J.C. and K.M.C.
Defendant: City Of Oakland, ROLAND HOLMGREN, CULLEN FAETH, JOE TURNER, TREVOR STRATTON and BRYAN BUDGIN
Case Number: 3:2016cv06256
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 38 40 Motions to Dismiss. Amended complaint, if any, due by 5/12/2017. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
February 9, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 11 17 Motions to Dismiss. Amended complaint, if any, due by 3/10/2017. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 3, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing briefing and hearing schedule. Opposition to 17 Motion to dismiss filed by Budgin and Turner due by 1/17/2017. Reply due by 1/24/2017. Motion Hearing on both 11 17 Motions to dismiss set for 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/03/17 (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORTEZ et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLGA CORTEZ
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEMESIO CORTEZ
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.J.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Selia Monique Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLAND HOLMGREN
Represented By: Selia Monique Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CULLEN FAETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVOR STRATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN BUDGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?