Davis v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC

Plaintiff: Celeste Davis
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06263
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Stipulation RE Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
May 10, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
March 6, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re DOCKET NOS. 18 , 19 : Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/6/2017; Designation of Experts due by 11/6/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 12/1/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/ 15/2017; Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (10-DAY) set for 5/14/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
November 18, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice AS TO Delikat, Michael. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Davis
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Dickson
Represented By: Emily Anne Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Erin M. Connell
Represented By: Michael Delikat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?