Buckingham Apartments Tenants' Association et al v. Trion Properties, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eduardo Murillo, Norma Corvera, Dora Diaz, Sandra Figueroa, Laura Hernandez, Juan Jimenez, Isabel Martinez and Buckingham Apartments Tenants' Association
Defendant: Trion Properties, Inc. and 180 Buckingham Property, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06278
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/14/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
November 7, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 11/7/2016. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 1, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Opposition due by 11/2/2016. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 11/3/2016 at 09:15 AM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckingham Apartments Tenants' Association et al v. Trion Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Murillo
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Corvera
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Diaz
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Figueroa
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hernandez
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jimenez
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Martinez
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buckingham Apartments Tenants' Association
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Salimah Khadijah Hankins
Represented By: Margaret M McBride
Represented By: David Ryan Medina
Represented By: Sonia E Valdez
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe Rayburn
Represented By: Jason Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trion Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Taraneh Fard
Represented By: Louise Ann Fernandez
Represented By: Scott Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 180 Buckingham Property, LLC
Represented By: Taraneh Fard
Represented By: Louise Ann Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?