Marino v. CAcafe, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Leona Marino
Defendant: CAcafe, Inc., Jane Zheng, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Club Demonstration Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06291
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE LAST KNOWN ADDRESSES FOR REMAINING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS re 70 Notice (Other) filed by Leona Marino.Filing by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 28, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 39 Motion of Plaintiff Leona Marino for Corrective Action. [Exhibit A attached to Order] (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
March 17, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE OSC FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST WON KEE (DAN) LEE re 42 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Jane Zheng, Ted Chao, CAcafe, Inc. The OSC hearing set March 24, 2017 at 9:01AM shall remain on calendar. The hearing shall remain on calendar and Lead Counsel shall appear in person. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/17/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 8, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH STANDING ORDER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 3/24/2017 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/8/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marino v. CAcafe, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Marino
Represented By: Eduard R Meleshinsky
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAcafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Demonstration Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?