Gaynor v. Chatila et al

Plaintiff: Paul J. Gaynor
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila and Brian Wuebbels
Case Number: 3:2016cv06305
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: SUNEDISON, INC., SECURITIES LITIGATION. MDL No. 2742. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair on 8/2/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
May 17, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 STIPULATION To Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Hearing on Pending Motions Until Resolution of MDL Transfer Order. Hearing on Motions/Case Management Conference Reset for 9/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
March 2, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Stipulation. Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing continued to 5/31/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/2/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 3, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaynor v. Chatila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila
Represented By: Sarah Zenewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wuebbels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. Gaynor
Represented By: Charles Michael Louderback
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?