Petrie v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Justin Petrie
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Berkshire Bank, HSBC Bank USA, National Association and Monterey Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2016cv06348
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting without leave to amend 74 Motion to Dismiss. Proposed form of Judgment filed no later than 8/14/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
April 12, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINTS; BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING STAY; DENYING STIPULATIONS AS MOOT; AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN CASE NO. 17-CV-0416. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
March 21, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs response filed within seven days of this Order. Case temporarily stayed until briefing completed. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
January 25, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 31 Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Inc.'s Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
December 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
November 23, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 18 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrie v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Petrie
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Terri R Brown
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Bank
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?