Power Integrations, Inc. v. On Semiconductor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Defendant: On Semiconductor Corporation and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06371
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT 42 POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
March 21, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 18 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS FOR SIXTY DAYS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
November 28, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. Power Integrations, Inc. v. ON Semiconductor Corporation, Case No. 16-6371 BLF, is not related to Power Integrations, Inc. v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al., Case No. 15-4854 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Integrations, Inc. v. On Semiconductor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Howard Glenn Pollack
Represented By: Frank Everett Scherkenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Jon Vensel Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jon Vensel Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?