Starboard Commercial Brokerage Inc. v. Colliers International

Plaintiff: Starboard Commercial Brokerage Inc.
Defendant: Colliers International
Case Number: 3:2016cv06421
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by Colliers International, Motions terminated: 37 , 7 Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
April 27, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/27/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
March 13, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINES RELATING TO JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup denying 30 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
February 2, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY [re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Colliers International]. Jurisdictional Discovery due by 3/23 /2017. Starboard's Response due by 3/30/2017. Collier's Reply due by 4/13/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/2/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 23, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT [re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion, Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Colliers International. Responses due by NOON ON 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/23/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 18, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starboard Commercial Brokerage Inc. v. Colliers International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starboard Commercial Brokerage Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colliers International
Represented By: Scott Michael McLeod
Represented By: Gregory Carr Noschese
Represented By: Jill Battilega Rowe, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?