Shapiro v. Lundhal et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Shapiro
Defendant: Eric Lundahl, Baja Pirates of California, Baja Pirates and Baja Pirates of Mexico
Case Number: 3:2016cv06444
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Eric Lundahl. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/9/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
July 7, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 34 Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
May 10, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 27 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
March 7, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2017.(mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. Lundhal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Vance Nudelman
Represented By: Emil John Vodonick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baja Pirates of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baja Pirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baja Pirates of Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?