McKinney-Drobnis v. Massage Envy Franchising, LLC

Plaintiff: Baerbel McKinney-Drobnis, Joseph B. Piccola and Camille Berlese
Defendant: Massage Envy Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06450
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE AND VACATE DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION. All proceedings are stayed until further order of this Court. The parties shall have through and including February 16, 2018 to participate in a mediation. The parties, no later than March 16, 2018, shall file a notice of proposed settlement and proposed counsel or a joint request to lift the stay. Defendant shall have through and including 14 days following the date the stay is lifted to file an objection to the order of October 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 24, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 83 85 Joint Discovery Letter. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
May 17, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND MOTION TO STAY; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 8, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 5, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. The Second, Third, Fourth and Seve nth Affirmative Defenses are stricken without leave to amend. The First, Twelfth, Fifteenth, Sixteenth, Seventeenth, Eighteenth, Nineteenth, Twenty-First, Twenty-Fourth, Twenty-Fifth, Twenty-Sixth, Twenty-Eighth and Twenty-Ninth Affirmative Defenses are stricken without prejudice. The Fifth, Sixth, Eighth, Ninth, Eleventh, Thirteenth, Fourteenth, and Twenty-Third Affirmative Defenses are stricken with leave to amend; should MEF seek to amend its answer, MEF shall file its Amended Answer no later than April 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 5, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
February 10, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MASSAGE ENVY FRANCHISING, LLC'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY. All discovery in this action is stayed until the Court issues its ruling on defendant's pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney-Drobnis v. Massage Envy Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baerbel McKinney-Drobnis
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B. Piccola
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Berlese
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massage Envy Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Luanne Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?