IMDb.com, Inc. v. Harris Featured Case

A case challenging the constitutionality of California Assembly Bill 1687, a law designed to combat age discrimination the the entertainment industry.

Plaintiff: IMDb.com, Inc.
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Case Number: 3:2016cv06535
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2018 Filing 92 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/20/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on February 20, 2018. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas Elliott Mirell (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Douglas Elliott Mirell (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
November 8, 2017 Filing 88 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/26/2017, before Judge Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, telephone number (530)941-2621; sarah_goekler@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 87 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018. (Related documents(s) 87 ) (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Vince Chhabria by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, for Court Reporter Kristen Moody. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2017 re 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IMDb.com, Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission after hearing oral argument and will issue a written ruling.FTR Time: 10:07- 10:25. Plaintiff Attorney: John Hueston and Moez Kaba. Defendant Attorney: Anthony Hakl for Becerra; Douglas Mirell for SAG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2017) Modified on 11/7/2017: Matter transcribed by Sarah Goekler. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists re 84 Reply to Opposition/Response Notice of Joinder in reply re Cross motion for Summary Judgement (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 84 REPLY (re 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byXavier Becerra. (Hakl, Anthony) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 83 REPLY (re 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Marilyn Szatmary in Opposition to 80 Opposition/Response to Motion, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 80-1 filed byScreen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Related document(s) 80 ) (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists re 79 Opposition/Response to Motion, Notice of Joinder in Opposition and Cross-Motion (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 80 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Opposition of Defendant/ Intervenor SAG-AFTRA to Motion for Summary Judgement filed byScreen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Marilyn Szatmary in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgement)(Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 79 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byXavier Becerra. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony Hakl in Support of Defendant's Opposition on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment)(Hakl, Anthony) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 9/14/2017. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 77 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE DATE FOR HEARING THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. No other dates or deadlines are impacted by this change. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/15/17 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by IMDb.com, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 75 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 74 Stipulation SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND REQUESTING HEARING DATE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 8/10/2017. Cross Motions due by 8/24/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND REQUESTING HEARING DATE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY, by Hon. Vince Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Discovery Hearing held on 6/15/2017. The Court heard argument from the parties regarding the Joint Discovery Letter, Dkt. No. 68 , and will issue a written ruling. FTR Time 10:24 - 10:52. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam Olin. Defendant Attorney: Anthony Hakl for Bacerra; Douglas Mirell for Intervenor Defendant - SAG. This is a text-only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2017) Modified on 7/11/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2017 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE DISCOVERY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 5/25/2017 TO 6/15/2017. Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 70 RESPONSE to re 68 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Request to Conduct Limited Discovery by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 68 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Request to Conduct Limited Discovery ) filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
April 21, 2017 Filing 68 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Request to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Xavier Becerra. (Hakl, Anthony) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 67 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 21, 2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 65 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (Related documents(s) 65 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 66 *** SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT 67 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on March 21, 2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 65 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (Related documents(s) 65 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/3/2017) Modified on 4/3/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2017 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/21/17 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 64 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 63 Case Management Conference - Initial,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, ), by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. Court will send to Vivian Winn at vwinn@hmafirm.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-11256201). (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 21, 2017 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/21/2017. No discovery permitted at this time. Defendants are ordered to draft all discovery requests they want to serve in this case and include in their discovery briefs. Defendants' discovery briefs due 4/21/2017 (10 pages per side). Plaintiff's response due by 5/5/2017 (15 pages total). Defendants' optional reply due by 5/12/2017 (4 pages per side). Discovery Hearing set for 5/25/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria.FTR Time 2:35- 3:12. Plaintiff Attorney Adam Olin and Moez Kaba. Defendant Attorney Anthony Hakl for Bacerra; Douglas Mirell for SAG. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2017) Modified on 3/23/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2017 Filing 62 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMDb.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AMAZON.COM,INC. for IMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE TIME FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONVERTING THE HEARING TO A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The matter is rescheduled to the following time due to one or more parties requesting to appear telephonically at the hearing. Plaintiff shall provide the Court and all other parties a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the case management conference by way of email to the Court (vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov) with a cc to opposing counsel. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. *Please note, this hearing will be by phone for all parties and counsels, but will be heard in open court in case any members of the public wish to listen in. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear by Telephone in Case Management Conference filed by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 57 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/16/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 10:26 a.m. - 11:09 a.m. = 43 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 50 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2017. (Related documents(s) 50 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 56 Letter from Plaintiff IMDb.com, Inc. re Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 55 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on 2/23/2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 22, 2017 Filing 54 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the Initial Case Management Conference. The Court will set a new date in the order ruling on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 16, 2017 Filing 51 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 49 Motion Hearing,, ), by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. Court will send to Vivian Winn at vwinn@hmafirm.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-11164336). (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 16, 2017 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/16/2017 before Hon. Vince Chhabria by IMDb.com, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/16/2017) Modified on 2/16/2017: NOTE: Ordering Party has changed delivery to '7-Days' via phone call on 2-16-2017. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2017 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2017 re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by IMDb.com, Inc. The Court hears argument and takes the matter under submission. A written ruling will be issued.FTR Time 10:26- 11:09. Plaintiff Attorney: John Hueston and Moez Kaba. Defendant Attorney: Anthony Hakl. Intervenor Defendant Attorney: Douglas Mirell.Amicus - AAPR Attorney: Barbara Jones.This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2017) Modified on 2/16/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/15/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 8, 2017 Filing 47 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 8, 2017 Filing 46 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on February 23, 2017 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 44 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hakl, Anthony) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 42 Declaration of Moez M. Kaba in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 40 ) (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 41 Declaration of Giancarlo Cairella in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 40 REPLY (re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE SUBSTITUTED PARTY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/27/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 19 Motion to Intervene. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byScreen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injuction filed by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 35 Brief Amici Curiae filed byAARP & AARP Foundation. (Jones, Barbara) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Jones (Jones, Barbara) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 33 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 26 Motion For Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, The First Amendment Coalition, The Media Law Resource Center, The Wikimedia Foundation, and The Center For Democracy & Technology In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by Electronic Frontier Foundation.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 31 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 23, 2017 Filing 30 Statement of Non-Opposition re 19 MOTION to Intervene filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byKamala Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hakl, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 28 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Breaux.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 27 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice -Fohn.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION For Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, The First Amendment Coalition, The Media Law Resource Center, The Wikimedia Foundation, and The Center For Democracy & Technology In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, The First Amendment Coalition, The Media Law Resource Center, The Wikimedia Foundation, and The Center For Democracy & Technology In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Proposed Order)(Greene, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (farS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Greene for Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, The First Amendment Coalition, The Media Law Resource Center, The Wikimedia Foundation, and The Center For Democracy & Technology (Greene, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 24 Brief of Amici Curiae First Amendment Scholars and Legal Organizations filed byEnrique Armijo, Jane Bambauer, Erwin Chemerinsky, First Amendment Lawyers Association, Lyrissa Lidsky, David Olson, David Post, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Thomas C. Rubin, Saurabh Vishnubhakat, Eugene Volokh. (Sungaila, Mary-Christine) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Amici Curiae Firsst Amendment Legal Scholars and Legal Organizations ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11071282.) filed by Enrique Armijo, Jane Bambauer, Erwin Chemerinsky, First Amendment Lawyers Association, Lyrissa Lidsky, David Olson, David Post, Raymond Pryke, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Thomas C. Rubin, Saurabh Vishnubhakat, Eugene Volokh. (Breaux, Natasha) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Amici Curiae First Amendment Legal Scholars and Legal Organizations ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 2602ACP6.) Filing fee previously paid on 01/12/2017 filed by Enrique Armijo, Jane Bambauer, Erwin Chemerinsky, First Amendment Lawyers Association, Lyrissa Lidsky, David Olson, David Post, Raymond Pryke, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Thomas C. Rubin, Saurabh Vishnubhakat, Eugene Volokh. (Fohn, Polly) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary-Christine Sungaila for Amici Curiae First Amendment Scholars and Legal Organizations (Sungaila, Mary-Christine) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint in Intervention byScreen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 1/23/2017. Replies due by 1/30/2017. (Mirell, Douglas) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 18 Declaration of Moez M. Kaba in Support of 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 17 Declaration of Giancarlo Cairella in Support of 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 1/19/2017. Replies due by 2/2/2017. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 1/5/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 15 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 14 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Requesting Hearing Date.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND REQUESTING HEARING DATE filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Chhabria denying 12 Stipulation. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND REQUESTING HEARING DATE filed by IMDb.com, Inc.. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint byKamala Harris. (Hakl, Anthony) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IMDb.com, Inc. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/16/16. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IMDb.com, Inc... (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kamala Harris. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2017. Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/25/2016. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Olin, Adam) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against Kamala Harris ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10922647.). Filed byIMDb.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olin, Adam) (Filed on 11/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMDb.com, Inc. v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMDb.com, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Hueston
Represented By: Moez Mansoor Kaba
Represented By: Adam Lee Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Anthony Richard Hakl, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?