Larson v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)

Plaintiff: Barbara Larson
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Case Number: 3:2016cv06678
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 9 MOTION FOR REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 6, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to LaSalle, John. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Siegel, Norman. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: John F LaSalle
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Alan B Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Larson
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: John J Schirger
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?