District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Pete Chacon Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, John Maggiore, Marian Bourboulis and District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Defendant: Pete Chacon Construction, Inc. and Vanessa Chacon
Case Number: 3:2016cv06730
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THE CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/02/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 1, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick. The May 3, 2017 hearing is VACATED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
February 21, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2017. Case Management Conference continued to 5/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/21/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Pete Chacon Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Bourboulis
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Chacon Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?