Hollins et al v. Cordis Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Robin Hollins and Lola Hollins
Defendant: Cordis Corporation and Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06740
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ALAMEDA. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/29/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 8, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/8/2017. Show Cause Response due by 6/12/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/5/2017. Show Cause Response due by 6/1/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
March 20, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (pursuant to 17 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. Status Report due by 7/6/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
January 30, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (pursuant to 15 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollins et al v. Cordis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hollins
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Hollins
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew D. Kaplan
Represented By: Kevin Cooper Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confluent Medical Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tammara Nicole Bokmuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?