Kelly v. Bay Area Toll Authority et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Kelly
Defendant: Bay Area Toll Authority, Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District and Xerox State and Local Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06837
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 41 to Continue Deadline to File Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 16, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 30 EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/16/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 7, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 26 to Continue Dates in the Court's January 27, 2017 Order Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 25, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule On Defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Bay Area Toll Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Toll Authority
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Samantha D. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District
Represented By: Alexandra V. Atencio
Represented By: Samantha D. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox State and Local Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Kimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Kelly
Represented By: Po Satia Chhim
Represented By: Blake Joseph Lindemann
Represented By: Daren M. Schlecter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?