Hussein v. Patriot Contract Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Ali Hussein
Defendant: Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv06881
Filed: November 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/22/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
May 15, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2017. Case Management Conference continued to 6/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/15/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
April 16, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 5/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/16/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Hussein
Represented By: Dennis Michael O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?