Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. DeSilva Gates Construction, L.P.

Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Defendant: DeSilva Gates Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2016cv06948
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 TO DISMISS ACTION filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
May 9, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Case Management Conference and Mandatory Settlement Conference filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Further CMC set for 8/3/17 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
February 23, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. DeSilva Gates Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeSilva Gates Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?