National Fair Housing Alliance Inc et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae")
Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance Inc, Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California, Central Ohio Fair Housing Association, Connecticut Fair Housing Center, Denver Metro Fair Housing Center, Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana, Fair Housing Center of Greater Palm Beaches, Fair Housing Center of West Michigan, Fair Housing Continuum Inc., Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Virginia, Housing Opportunities Project for Excellence, Inc., Housing Research & Advocacy Center, Miami Valley Fair Housing Center, Metro Fair Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, North Texas Fair Housing Center, Open Communities, Inc., South Suburban Housing Center and Toledo Fair Housing Center
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae")
Case Number: 3:2016cv06969
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/24/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2019. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fair Housing Alliance Inc et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance Inc
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Morgan Whitney Williams
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Advocates of Northern California
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Casey G Epp
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Ohio Fair Housing Association
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Fair Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Metro Fair Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Central Indiana
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Greater Palm Beaches
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of West Michigan
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Continuum Inc.
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPE Fair Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Opportunities Made Equal of Virginia
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Opportunities Project for Excellence, Inc.
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Research & Advocacy Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Valley Fair Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Fair Housing Services
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Texas Fair Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Communities, Inc.
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Suburban Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toledo Fair Housing Center
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Stephen M. Dane
Represented By: Glenn Schlactus
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association ("Fannie Mae")
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?