McBain v. Behr Paint Corporation

Plaintiff: Ryan McBain
Defendant: Behr Paint Corporation, Behr Process Corporation and Masco Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv07036
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/24/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 11, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Supplemental declaration due July 19, 2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
April 3, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBain v. Behr Paint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan McBain
Represented By: Byron R. Goldstein
Represented By: Ginger Lee Grimes
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: William C Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behr Paint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behr Process Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?