Ortiz v. Volt Management Corp et al

Plaintiff: Adan Ortiz
Defendant: Volt Management Corp and Genco I, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07096
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING GENCO'S MOTION TO COMPEL; STAYING ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION re 31 MOTION for Joinder In Motion To Compel Arbitration of Defendant Volt filed by Genco I, Inc., ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/2/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 11, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 22 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
January 24, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 16-cv-04601-YGR. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/24/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Volt Management Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Ortiz
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volt Management Corp
Represented By: Brian Davis Berry
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genco I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?