Moralez v. Philz Coffee, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: Philz Coffee, Inc. and 1600 Shattuck Associates
Case Number: 3:2016cv07102
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Stipulation to (1) Shorten Briefing Schedule on Cross-Defendant Philz Coffee, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and (2) Allow Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2017; Motions due by 11/27/2017; Responses due by 12/7/2017; Replies due by 12/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 6, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 4, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 14, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Administrative Motion requesting Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2017; Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. Philz Coffee, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philz Coffee, Inc.
Represented By: Sue Jacobs Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1600 Shattuck Associates
Represented By: Sue Jacobs Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?