Robey v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Robey
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07212
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 Amended Complaint, re Order Concerning Time to File Response to Amended Complaint filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 10, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 Amended Complaint, Concerning Time to File Response to Amended Complaint filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
March 6, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 Requesting Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robey v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robey
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?