AllCells, LLC v. Jack Zhai et al
Plaintiff: AllCells, LLC
Defendant: Jack Zhai, James Lee and Cepheus Biosciences, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07323
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 132 Re Remit Bond filed by AllCells, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 130 FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; FINAL JUDGMENT > filed by AllCells, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/16/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 124 re Joint Request for Stay Pending Settlement filed by James Lee, Jack Zhai. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 117 re Extension of Time for Answer filed by AllCells, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 110 , 111 Early Summary Adjudication Proceedings. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 11 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction -- REDACTED/PUBLIC VERSION OF 104 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part 81 , 88 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 47 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND TRADE SECRETS filed by AllCells, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Joint Stipulation Permitting Mutual Expedited Discovery and Setting Preliminary Injunction Schedule filed by AllCells, LLC. 12 MOTION to Expedite Discovery terminated. Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 3/23/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 3/9/2017. Replies due by 3/16/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time Without Prejudice. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AllCells, LLC v. Jack Zhai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AllCells, LLC
Represented By: Aoife Marie Duffy
Represented By: Johanna Lynn Jacob
Represented By: Catherine Yunshan Lui
Represented By: Robert Scott Shwarts
Represented By: Michael David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Zhai
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bringuel
Represented By: Eugene Lee Hahm
Represented By: Jennifer Sewon Jung
Represented By: Enoch H Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lee
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bringuel
Represented By: Eugene Lee Hahm
Represented By: Jennifer Sewon Jung
Represented By: Enoch H Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cepheus Biosciences, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bringuel
Represented By: Eugene Lee Hahm
Represented By: Jennifer Sewon Jung
Represented By: Enoch H Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?