Software Research, Inc. v. Seapine Software, Inc.

Plaintiff: Software Research, Inc.
Defendant: Seapine Software, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv07353
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 57 Stipulation filed by Software Research, Inc. All deadlines vacated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 8, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE MEDIDATION re 53 Notice (Other) filed by Software Research, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
April 24, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 40 Joint Letter of April 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/2017. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 13, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 selecting Mediation by Software Research, Inc. and Seapine Software, Inc. filed by Software Research, Inc. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
February 21, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Software Research, Inc. v. Seapine Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Software Research, Inc.
Represented By: Evan N. Budaj
Represented By: Benjamin Laban Singer
Represented By: Douglas Stephen Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seapine Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?