Drevaleva v. Alameda Health System et al

Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva
Defendant: Alameda Health System and Department of Industrial Relations
Case Number: 3:2016cv07414
Filed: December 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The court revokes the plaintiff's _in forma pauperis_ status for purposes of appeal. The Clerk shall notify the plaintiff and the Court of Appeals of this order. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(4).The plaintiff may file a motion for leav e to proceed _in forma pauperis_ in the Court of Appeals within 30 days of this order. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). See the attached order for fuller discussion and instructions.Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/24/2017. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 7, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 63 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff's claims against the individual DLSE defendants are dismissed with prejudice. This leaves the plaintiff without a viable claim in this court. The court will enter a separate judgment to terminate this case. See attached order for fuller discussion. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 41 Motion to Dismiss; denying 54 Administrative Motion. The attached order also concerns the Department of Industrial Relations -- Division of Labor Standards Enforcement defendants, and asks the Department's attorneys to take certain action within 14 days of this order. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
March 21, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 26 Motion to Supplement Opposition; and finding as moot 33 Application to Expedite Case-Management Conf erence. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend.The plaintiff must file any amended complaint within 21 days from the date of this order. If she does not, then the dismissal will be without prejudice to filing a lawsuit in state court. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drevaleva v. Alameda Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda Health System
Represented By: Timothy C Travelstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Industrial Relations
Represented By: Doris Y. Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?