Bruzzone v. Intel Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Michael A. Bruzzone
Defendant: Intel Corporation and Arm, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016mc80042
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REJECTING THE COMPLAINT AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/16/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 25, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Hon. William Alsup no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/25/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL AND FOR REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/24/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruzzone v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bruzzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?