Beaver County Employers Retirement Fund v. Tile Shop Holdings, Inc.

Plaintiff: Beaver County Employers Retirement Fund, Erie County Employees' Retirement System and Luc Dewulf
Defendant: Tile Shop Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016mc80062
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING (27) MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE 3:16-mc-80062-JSC.Associated Cases: 3:16-mc-80062-JSC, 3:16-mc-80076-JSC(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
June 29, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 23 Motion for Leave to File. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 7, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying (1) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-mc-80062-JSC; denying (1) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-mc-80076-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
April 12, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 16-mc-80076-KAW. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/12/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaver County Employers Retirement Fund v. Tile Shop Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaver County Employers Retirement Fund
Represented By: Paul Aaron Breucop
Represented By: William J. Geddish
Represented By: Christopher T. Gilroy
Represented By: Stacey Marie Kaplan
Represented By: Matthew Leo Mustokoff
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Joseph Russello
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Paul Aaron Breucop
Represented By: William J. Geddish
Represented By: Christopher T. Gilroy
Represented By: Stacey Marie Kaplan
Represented By: Matthew Leo Mustokoff
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Joseph Russello
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luc Dewulf
Represented By: Paul Aaron Breucop
Represented By: William J. Geddish
Represented By: Christopher T. Gilroy
Represented By: Stacey Marie Kaplan
Represented By: Matthew Leo Mustokoff
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Joseph Russello
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tile Shop Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?