Federal Trade Commission v. D-Link Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: D-Link Corporation and D-Link Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00039
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:53
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2017 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission of Summons, Complaint, ECF Information, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference, and Standing Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Moriarty, Kevin) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 8 Summonses Issued as to D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Berger (Berger, Laura) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Moriarty (Moriarty, Kevin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Complaint, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tully, Cathlin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Tully, Cathlin) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for injunctive relief against D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc.. Filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-11, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tully, Cathlin) (Filed on 1/5/2017) Modified on 1/6/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. D-Link Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Laura Berger
Represented By: Kevin Moriarty
Represented By: Cathlin Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Christine Hurtado
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Massari
Represented By: Kara Elizabeth McKenna
Represented By: Michael David Pepson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?