Finjan, Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00072
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 670 REDACTED ORDER DENYING FINJAN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S APRIL 28, 2020 ORDER ON CISCO'S MOTION TO STRIKEre 662 Sealed Order Denying Finjan's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 28, 2020 Order on Cisco's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/18/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER granting 618 , 626 , 637 , 653 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/11/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER on 621 Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Request to Redact Transcript of Proceedings Held on April 21, 2020. Stipulation or noticed motion due by May 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/14/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER granting 617 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/13/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 616 REDACTED ORDER ON CISCO SYSTEMS, INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FINJAN'S AMENDED EXPERT REPORT ON INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT NO. 7,647,633 re 582 April 28, 2020 Sealed Order on Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Finjan's Amended Expert Report on Infringement of Patent No. 7,647,633. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/11/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting 491 507 523 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/28/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 REDACTED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CISCOS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT re 487 Sealed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Cisco's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/30/2020. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT STIPULATED PROPOSED REDACTIONS TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 20, 2020 ON OR BEFORE MARCH 27, 2020 by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020) (Entered: 03/20/2020
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER DENYING FINJAN, INC.'S MOTION 380 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF THE VALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,677,494 AND 6,154,844; AND 7,647,633. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/3/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 REDACTED ORDER ON MOTIONS RE EXPERT REPORTS re 404 Order on Stipulation, 397 Sealed Order on Motions Re Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/12/2019. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER GRANTING 329 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL AT ECF 329. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/16/2019.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL AT ECF 315 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/03/2019.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER DENYING REMAINDER OF 292 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER ON DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS Re: Dkt. Nos. 241 , 242 , 243 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/3/19. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 SECOND INTERIM ORDER ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS RE CISCO'S PRODUCTION OF CONVOYED/DERIVATIVE SALES INFORMATION, and ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 194 Discovery Letter Brief, 201 Joint Discovery Letter Brief for 3/15/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on March 13, 2019. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 FURTHER ORDER ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER RE FINJANS REQUEST TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF CISCO EMAILS [ECF 175; ECF 186] (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019) .
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen denying 174 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER CONSTRUING ADDITIONAL CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,154,844; 6,804,780; 7,647,633. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 FURTHER ORDER ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE DEPOSITION AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION BY DANIEL CHINN Dkt. No. 160 .Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 01/31/19. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING 144 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/22/2018.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 107 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,154,844; 6,804,780; 7,647,633; 8,141,154; 8,677,494. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER MODIFYING 61 ORDER REGARDING 56 CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 56 CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/28/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 33 DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/7/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY BENU WELLS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/6/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY JARRAD M. GUNTHER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE BY JOSEPH A. POWERS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James R. Hannah
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Shaw Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?