Cooper et al v. City and County of San Francisco

Plaintiff: Jennifer Cooper and Abolitionists Northwest
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2017cv00175
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/8/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
May 22, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Jennifer Cooper, City and County of San Francisco, Abolitionists Northwest. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/22/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
April 7, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS UPON CONSENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
February 21, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/21/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cooper
Represented By: Michael Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abolitionists Northwest
Represented By: Michael Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?