J. Jason Reynolds v. Direct Flow Medical, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: J. Jason Reynolds
Defendant: Direct Flow Medical, Inc., Dan Lemaitre, John David Boyle, Gordon Bishop, Paul LaViolette and Yuval Binur
Case Number: 3:2017cv00204
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE re 46 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Parties filed by Gordon Bishop, John David Boyle, Yuval Binur, Paul LaViolette, Dan Lemaitre, Direct Flow Medical, Inc., J. Jason Reynolds. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/13/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 27, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING PRIVATE ADR re 44 . STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Yuval Binur, Gordon Bishop, John David Boyle, Direct Flow Medical, Inc., Paul LaViolette, Dan Lemaitre filed by Gordon Bishop, John David Boyle, Yuval Binur, Paul LaViolette, Dan Lemaitre, Direct Flow Medical, Inc., J. Jason Reynolds. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/27/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
July 3, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. filed by Direct Flow (Assignment for the Benefit of Creditors), LLC, J. Jason Reynolds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/3/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017) Modified on 7/5/2017 (sisS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. Jason Reynolds v. Direct Flow Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Flow Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Lemaitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul LaViolette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuval Binur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Jason Reynolds
Represented By: Caroline Camille Corbitt
Represented By: John H. Douglas
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?